GA HB9 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on November 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-14 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Industry and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-14 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Industry and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 1 of Title 34 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions relative to labor and industrial relations, so as to provide that it shall be unlawful for any employer to include on an application for employment a question inquiring whether the applicant has ever been arrested for, charged with, or convicted of any crime; to provide for exceptions; to provide that such information may be sought during the first interview with the applicant; to provide that the criminal history records of an applicant may be sought after the first interview with the applicant; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Labor; unlawful for employer to include on application a question inquiring whether applicant has been arrested, charged, or convicted of any crime; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Tyrone Brooks [D] | Rep. Keisha Waites [D] | Rep. Dee Dawkins-Haigler [D] | Rep. Sandra Scott [D] |
Rep. Sheila Jones [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-14 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-01-13 | House | House First Readers |
2015-01-12 | House | House Hopper |
2014-11-21 | House | House Prefiled |