GA HB883 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 9 of Title 7 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to Georgia merchant acquirer limited purpose banks, so as to correct cross-references; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia merchant acquirer limited purpose banks; correct cross-references; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Strickland [R] | Rep. Earl Ehrhart [R] | Rep. Bruce Williamson [R] | Rep. Demetrius Douglas [D] |
Rep. Virgil Fludd [D] | Rep. Johnnie Caldwell [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate Vote #632 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Vote #674 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Vote #674 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2014-04-15 | Act 523 | |
2014-04-15 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2014-03-25 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-03-03 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2014-03-03 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-02-25 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-02-03 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-01-31 | House | House First Readers |
2014-01-28 | House | House Hopper |