GA HB878 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 6 of Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions relative to uniform rules of the road, so as to provide for proper procedure for passing a postal service vehicle; to provide for a definition; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Uniform rules of the road; proper procedure for passing a postal service vehicle; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Eddie Lumsden [R] | Rep. John Corbett [R] | Rep. Vance Smith [R] | Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] |
Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-31 - House - Passage: House Vote #420 (Y: 165 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-01-31 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2024-01-31 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-01-30 | House | House Postponed |
2024-01-24 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-01-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-01-10 | House | House First Readers |
2024-01-09 | House | House Hopper |