GA HB863 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progress
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 5 of Title 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to state purchasing, so as to change certain provisions relating to purchases without competitive bidding, central bid registry, procurement cards, rules and regulations, applicability to emergency purchases, and the Purchasing Advisory Council; to change a short title; to change certain provisions relating to definitions relative to small business assistance; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State purchasing; purchases without competitive bidding; change certain provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-03-20 - Senate Vote #653 - Passage (Y: 37 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House Vote #576 - Passage (Y: 128 N: 38 NV: 10 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-07-01 Effective Date
2012-05-01 Act 679
2012-05-01 House Date Signed by Governor
2012-04-02 House Sent to Governor
2012-03-20 Senate Passed/Adopted
2012-03-20 Senate Third Read
2012-03-19 Senate Read Second Time
2012-03-14 Senate Committee Favorably Reported
2012-03-05 Senate Read and Referred
2012-02-29 House Passed/Adopted
2012-02-29 House Third Readers
2012-02-27 House Withdrawn, Recommitted
2012-02-24 House Postponed
2012-02-23 House Postponed
2012-02-16 House Committee Favorably Reported
2012-02-02 House Second Readers
2012-02-01 House First Readers

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback