GA HB78 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on May 3 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 16, Code Section 24-13-130, Chapter 5 of Title 30, and Article 4 of Chapter 8 of Title 31 of the O.C.G.A., relating to crimes and offenses, when depositions to preserve testimony in criminal proceedings may be taken, protection of disabled adults and elder persons, and reporting abuse or exploitation of residents in long-term care facilities; to change provisions relating to cruelty to a person 65 years of age or older; to prohibit exploitation of disabled adults, elder persons, and residents; to move relevant criminal penalties from Title 30 into Title 16; to amend Code Section 17-17-3, Title 31, Chapter 3 of Title 35, and Code Sections 42-8-63.1 and 49-2-14.1 of the O.C.G.A., so as to provide for conforming cross-references; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crimes and offenses; protection of disabled adults and elder persons; change provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-28 - House Vote #409 (Y: 167 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - Senate Vote #301 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - House Vote #218 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-07-01 Effective Date
2013-05-03 Act 132
2013-05-03HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2013-04-04HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2013-03-28HouseHouse Agrees Senate Amend or Sub
2013-03-26SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2013-03-26SenateSenate Third Read
2013-03-21SenateSenate Read Second Time
2013-03-21SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2013-03-11SenateSenate Read and Referred
2013-03-07HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2013-03-07HouseHouse Third Readers
2013-03-05HouseHouse Postponed
2013-02-26HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2013-01-28HouseHouse Second Readers
2013-01-17HouseHouse First Readers
2013-01-16HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback