GA HB773 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-15 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-15 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 1 of Article 4 of Chapter 11 of Title 16 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions relative to dangerous instrumentalities and practices, so as to change provisions relating to discharging a gun or pistol near a public highway or street; to provide for definitions; to provide for exceptions; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Crimes and offenses; discharging a gun or pistol near public highway or street; change provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Dickey [R] | Rep. James Epps [R] | Rep. Jay Roberts [R] | Rep. Willie Talton [R] |
Rep. James Shaw [R] | Sen. Ross Tolleson [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #750 (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - House Vote #880 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House Vote #507 (Y: 153 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - House Vote #880 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House Vote #507 (Y: 153 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-15 | Effective Date | |
2014-04-15 | Act 509 | |
2014-04-15 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2014-03-27 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2014-03-20 | House | House Agrees Senate Amend or Sub |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-02-11 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2014-02-11 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-02-06 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2014-02-04 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2014-01-22 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-01-21 | House | House First Readers |
2014-01-17 | House | House Hopper |