GA HB729 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Vetoed on April 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-16 - Veto V4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on April 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-16 - Veto V4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 48-5C-1 of the O.C.G.A., relating to definitions, exemption from taxation, allocation and disbursement of proceeds collected by tag agents, fair market value of vehicle appealable, and report, so as to change the manner for determining fair market value of motor vehicles subject to the tax; to provide for penalties for fraudulent applications for such reductions; to provide for the distribution of revenue to newly created municipalities; to amend Chapter 2 of Title 40 of the O.C.G.A., relating to registration and licensing of motor vehicles, so as to provide for multi-year decals for certain vehicles; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Revenue and taxation; manner for determining fair market value of motor vehicles subject to tax; change
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - House - House Vote #849 (Y: 128 N: 38 NV: 9 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #647 (Y: 36 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #696 (Y: 50 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Vote #684 (Y: 132 N: 41 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #647 (Y: 36 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #696 (Y: 50 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Vote #684 (Y: 132 N: 41 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-16 | Veto V4 | |
2014-04-16 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2014-03-27 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2014-03-20 | House | House Agrees Senate Amend or Sub |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-03-03 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2014-03-03 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-03-03 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2014-01-15 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-01-14 | House | House First Readers |
2014-01-13 | House | House Hopper |