GA HB707 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Engrossed on March 3 2014 - 50% progress
Action: 2014-03-13 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 1 of Title 31 of the O.C.G.A., relating to general provisions regarding health, to the state or any political subdivision, from engaging in an activity that aids in the enforcement of the federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act of 2010; to endow the Attorney General with authority to bring suit to enjoin violations of such prohibition and issue advisory rulings; to provide that neither the State of Georgia nor any of its political subdivisions shall establish a health care exchange; to provide that no agency, department, or other state entity shall authorize any person acting on behalf of such agency, department, or entity to undertake any action under the aegis of Section 2951 of the federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act of 2010; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The Georgia Health Care Freedom and ACA Noncompliance Act; enact

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-03 - House Vote #685 (Y: 115 N: 59 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-13SenateSenate Read Second Time
2014-03-13SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2014-03-04SenateSenate Read and Referred
2014-03-03HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2014-03-03HouseHouse Third Readers
2014-02-25HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2014-01-15HouseHouse Second Readers
2014-01-14HouseHouse First Readers
2014-01-13HouseHouse Hopper
2013-12-16HouseHouse Prefiled

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback