GA HB704 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-18 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-18 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to incorporate the City of South Fulton in Fulton County; to provide for a charter for the City of South Fulton; to provide for incorporation, boundaries, and powers of the city; to provide for general powers and limitations on powers; to provide for other matters relative to the foregoing; to provide for referenda; to provide for an automatic repeal; to provide effective dates and transitional provisions governing the transfer of various functions and responsibilities from Fulton County to the City of South Fulton; to provide for severability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
South Fulton, City of; incorporate; provide charter
Sponsors
Rep. Roger Bruce [D] | Rep. Virgil Fludd [D] | Rep. Margaret Kaiser [D] | Rep. Edward Lindsey [R] |
Rep. Ronnie Mabra [D] | Rep. LaDawn Jones [D] | Sen. Donzella James [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-20 - House - House Vote #545 (Y: 163 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn & Recommitted |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-02-20 | House | House Immediately Transmitted to Senate |
2014-02-20 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2014-02-20 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-02-18 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-02-07 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2014-01-27 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-01-24 | House | House First Readers |
2014-01-23 | House | House Hopper |
2013-12-09 | House | House Prefiled |