GA HB670 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-24 - Veto V3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on April 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-24 - Veto V3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 10-1-490 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to registration of businesses using trade names, so as to require registration of trade names with the clerk of superior court; to amend Article 2 of Chapter 6 of Title 15 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to clerks of superior courts, so as to establish a state-wide trade name registry; to provide for duties of clerks of superior courts; to provide for fees; to provide for related matters; to correct a cross-reference; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Trade names; require registration with the clerk of superior court; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Barry Fleming [R] | Rep. Mandi Ballinger [R] | Rep. Regina Quick [R] | Sen. Brian Strickland [R] |
Rep. Andrew Welch [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #734 (Y: 48 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - House Vote #867 (Y: 161 N: 4 NV: 10 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House Vote #551 (Y: 165 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - House Vote #867 (Y: 161 N: 4 NV: 10 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House Vote #551 (Y: 165 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-24 | Veto V3 | |
2014-04-24 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2014-03-27 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2014-03-20 | House | House Agrees Senate Amend or Sub |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted As Amended |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-02-21 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2014-02-21 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-02-18 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2013-03-28 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-03-26 | House | House First Readers |
2013-03-25 | House | House Hopper |