GA HB60 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progress
Action: 2014-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 3 of Article 4 of Chapter 11 of Title 16 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to carrying and possession of firearms, so as to provide an exemption from certain laws regarding the carrying and possession of firearms by retired judges; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms; certain laws regarding carrying and possession by retired judges; provide exemption

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-20 - House Vote #882 (Y: 112 N: 58 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate Vote #701 (Y: 37 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House Vote #746 (Y: 109 N: 55 NV: 9 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House Vote #747 (Y: 108 N: 54 NV: 11 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate Vote #588 (Y: 47 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House Vote #50 (Y: 167 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-07-01 Effective Date
2014-04-23 Act 604
2014-04-23HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2014-03-26HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2014-03-20HouseHouse Agrees Senate Amend or Sub
2014-03-18SenateSenate Agrees House Amend or Sub As Amended
2014-03-11HouseHouse Immediately Transmitted to Senate
2014-03-11HouseHouse Agrees Senate Amend or Sub As Amended
2014-03-10SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2014-03-10SenateSenate Third Read
2014-03-06SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2014-01-13SenateSenate Recommitted
2013-03-21SenateSenate Read Second Time
2013-03-21SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2013-02-14SenateSenate Read and Referred
2013-02-13HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2013-02-13HouseHouse Third Readers
2013-02-06HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2013-01-17HouseHouse Second Readers
2013-01-16HouseHouse First Readers
2013-01-15HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/display/20132014/HB/60
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20132014/128285.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20132014/129881.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20132014/130858.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20132014/135026.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20132014/142681.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20132014/144145.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20132014/144340.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20132014/144825.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=9544
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=11758
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=11805
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=11804
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=11927
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=12129

Bill Comments

feedback