GA HB516 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Engrossed on February 17 2014 - 50% progress, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-18 - House Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 47 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to retirement and pensions, so as to provide that an election to participate in the Regents Retirement Plan in lieu of the Teachers Retirement System of Georgia shall be revocable at will; to provide that persons who made an irrevocable election for such participation may nonetheless elect to participate in the Teachers Retirement System of Georgia; to provide for creditable service; to provide for application and transfer of funds; to provide conditions for an effective date and automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Retirement and pensions; election to participate in Regents Retirement Plan in lieu of Teachers Retirement System of Georgia shall be revocable at will; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-02-17 - House Vote #515 (Y: 92 N: 70 NV: 10 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-18HouseHouse Tabled
2014-02-18HouseHouse Reconsidered
2014-02-17HouseHouse Notice to Reconsider
2014-02-17HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2014-02-17HouseHouse Third Readers
2014-02-11HouseHouse Postponed
2014-02-05HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2013-03-04HouseHouse Second Readers
2013-03-01HouseHouse First Readers
2013-02-28HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback