GA HB459 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 9 of Chapter 6 of Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to speed restrictions, so as to modify provisions relating to impeding traffic flow and minimum speed in left-hand lanes; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Speed restrictions; impeding traffic flow and minimum speed in left-hand lanes; modify provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] | Rep. Lee Hawkins [R] | Rep. Eddie Lumsden [R] | Rep. Kevin Tanner [R] |
Rep. Jon Burns [R] | Rep. Barry Fleming [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate Vote #604 (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Vote #647 (Y: 64 N: 86 NV: 23 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2014-02-26 - House - House Vote #614 (Y: 162 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Vote #647 (Y: 64 N: 86 NV: 23 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2014-02-26 - House - House Vote #614 (Y: 162 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2014-04-15 | Act 495 | |
2014-04-15 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2014-03-24 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-02-26 | House | House Notice to Reconsider |
2014-02-26 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2014-02-26 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-02-24 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2013-02-26 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-02-25 | House | House First Readers |
2013-02-22 | House | House Hopper |