GA HB348 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-04 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-04 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 7 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the imposition, rate, computation, and exemptions regarding income tax, so as to provide a tax credit for purchasers of alternative fuel vehicles; to provide for definitions; to provide for procedures, conditions, and limitations; to provide for a cap on the amount of the tax credits; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Income tax credit; purchasers of alternative fuel vehicles; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Don Parsons [R] | Rep. Chuck Sims [R] | Rep. Stacey Abrams [D] | Rep. Charles Martin [R] |
Sen. Rick Jeffares [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #648 (Y: 36 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #691 (Y: 41 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Vote #682 (Y: 116 N: 53 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #691 (Y: 41 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Vote #682 (Y: 116 N: 53 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-04 | Effective Date | |
2014-04-04 | Act 355 | |
2014-04-04 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2014-03-26 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-03-03 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2014-03-03 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-02-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2013-02-19 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-02-14 | House | House First Readers |
2013-02-13 | House | House Hopper |