GA HB348 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 14 of Title 40 of the O.C.G.A., relating to use of speed detection devices and red light cameras, so as to provide for standards for signs warning of the use of automated traffic enforcement safety devices; to amend Title 15 of the O.C.G.A., relating to courts, so as to authorize district attorneys, solicitors-general, and prosecuting attorneys to enforce civil monetary penalties relative to the enforcement of laws regarding speeding in a school zone using recorded images; to amend Code Section 40-6-163 of the O.C.G.A., relating to duty of driver of vehicle meeting or overtaking school bus, reporting of violations, and civil monetary penalty for violations captured by school bus camera, so as to revise penalties for failure to pay a civil monetary penalty relating to illegal passing of a school bus; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Motor vehicles; standards for signs warning of use of automated traffic enforcement safety devices; provide
Sponsors
Rep. J Collins [R] | Rep. Eddie Lumsden [R] | Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] | Rep. Trey Rhodes [R] |
Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. Ron Stephens [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-02 - House - Passage: House Vote #149 (Y: 168 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn & Recommitted |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-03-02 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2023-03-02 | House | House Third Readers |
2023-03-02 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-02-28 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2023-02-27 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-02-14 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-02-13 | House | House First Readers |
2023-02-09 | House | House Hopper |