GA HB346 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-18 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-18 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing for the consolidation of the offices of tax receiver of Fulton County and tax collector of Fulton County into the office of tax commissioner of Fulton County, approved February 21, 1951 (Ga. L. 1951, p. 3006), as amended, particularly by an Act approved May 9, 2002 (Ga. L. 2002, p. 5680), so as to provide for a citation of authority; to provide for the appointment of the tax commissioner of Fulton County; to limit certain compensation of the tax commissioner; to provide for submission of this Act under the federal Voting Rights Act of 1965, as amended; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Fulton County; appointment of tax commissioner; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Harry Geisinger [R] | Rep. Jan Jones [R] | Rep. Edward Lindsey [R] | Rep. Wendell Willard [R] |
Rep. Lynne Riley [R] | Rep. Joe Wilkinson [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #654 (Y: 34 N: 17 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - House - House Vote #128 (Y: 57 N: 98 NV: 13 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2013-03-01 - House - House Vote #129 (Y: 51 N: 102 NV: 15 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2013-03-01 - House - House Vote #132 (Y: 100 N: 56 NV: 13 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - House - House Vote #128 (Y: 57 N: 98 NV: 13 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2013-03-01 - House - House Vote #129 (Y: 51 N: 102 NV: 15 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2013-03-01 - House - House Vote #132 (Y: 100 N: 56 NV: 13 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-03-01 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2013-03-01 | House | House Third Readers |
2013-03-01 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-02-19 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-02-14 | House | House First Readers |
2013-02-13 | House | House Hopper |