GA HB266 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-05 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-05 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to revenue and taxation, so as to define the terms "Internal Revenue Code" and "Internal Revenue Code of 1986" and thereby incorporate certain provisions of the federal law into Georgia law; to provide that certain corporate income tax elections made for federal income tax purposes shall also apply for state income tax purposes; to provide an effective date; to provide applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Internal Revenue Code; certain provisions of federal law into Georgia law; incorporate
Sponsors
Rep. Allen Peake [R] | Sen. Don Balfour [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #123 (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #124 (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - House - House Vote #209 (Y: 171 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - House - House Vote #175 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - Senate - Senate Vote #88 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - Senate - Senate Vote #89 (Y: 41 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - House - House Vote #98 (Y: 170 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #124 (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - House - House Vote #209 (Y: 171 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - House - House Vote #175 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - Senate - Senate Vote #88 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - Senate - Senate Vote #89 (Y: 41 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - House - House Vote #98 (Y: 170 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-05 | Effective Date | |
2013-03-05 | Act 8 | |
2013-03-05 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2013-03-05 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2013-03-05 | House | House Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Appointed 9th, 32nd, 45th |
2013-03-05 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed 146th, 141st, 95th |
2013-03-05 | House | House Insists |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate Disagrees House Amend/Sub |
2013-03-04 | House | House Immediately Transmitted to Senate |
2013-03-04 | House | House Agrees Senate Amend or Sub As Amended |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Senate Transmits House |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-02-26 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2013-02-26 | House | House Third Readers |
2013-02-20 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2013-02-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-02-08 | House | House First Readers |
2013-02-07 | House | House Hopper |