GA HB15 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-15 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Regulated Industries Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 2 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-15 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Regulated Industries Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 10 of Title 25 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to regulation of fireworks, so as to allow for the sale of consumer fireworks not prohibited under federal law; to provide for a short title; to provide for definitions; to amend Code Section 16-7-80 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to definitions relative to crimes related to explosives and other devices, so as to correct cross-references; to amend Chapter 60 of Title 36 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions applicable to counties and municipal corporations, so as to allow for local regulation of fireworks; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
American Heritage Celebration Act; enact
Sponsors
Rep. Scot Turner [R] | Rep. Trey Kelley [R] | Rep. B.J. Pak [R] | Rep. Sam Teasley [R] |
Rep. Wesley Cantrell [R] | Rep. Michael Caldwell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-15 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-01-14 | House | House First Readers |
2015-01-13 | House | House Hopper |
2014-12-02 | House | House Prefiled |