GA HB142 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 5 of Title 21 of the O.C.G.A., relating to ethics in government, so as to change certain provisions relating to powers and duties of the Georgia Government Transparency and Campaign Finance Commission; to change certain provisions relating to definitions relative to public officers' conduct and lobbyist disclosure; to change certain provisions relating to lobbyist registration requirements, application for registration, supplemental registration, expiration, docket, fees, identification cards, public rosters, and exemptions; to regulate certain contact between lobbyists and members of the General Assembly and the making or acceptance of certain expenditures; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Government Transparency and Campaign Finance Commission; change certain provisions
Sponsors
Rep. David Ralston [R] | Rep. Larry O'Neal [R] | Rep. Calvin Smyre [D] | Rep. Jan Jones [R] |
Rep. Edward Lindsey [R] | Rep. Richard Smith [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #370 (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-28 - House - House Vote #441 (Y: 169 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-25 - House - House Vote #375 (Y: 166 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #223 (Y: 31 N: 15 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #233 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - House Vote #92 (Y: 164 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-03-28 - House - House Vote #441 (Y: 169 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-25 - House - House Vote #375 (Y: 166 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #223 (Y: 31 N: 15 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #233 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - House Vote #92 (Y: 164 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-01 | Effective Date | |
2013-05-06 | Act 134 | |
2013-05-06 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2013-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2013-03-28 | House | House Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Appointed 16th, 48th, 53rd |
2013-03-25 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed 146th, 40th, 5th |
2013-03-25 | House | House Insists |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Senate Disagrees House Amend/Sub |
2013-03-25 | House | House Agrees Senate Amend or Sub As Amended |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Senate Transmits House |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-02-25 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2013-02-25 | House | House Third Readers |
2013-02-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2013-01-31 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-01-30 | House | House First Readers |
2013-01-29 | House | House Hopper |