GA HB1115 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating one or more community improvement districts in unincorporated Fulton County and within each municipality therein, approved April 3, 1987 (Ga. L. 1987, p. 5460), as amended, particularly by an Act approved April 2, 1998 (Ga. L. 1998, p. 4065), as amended, so as to change certain definitions; to change certain provisions regarding written consent of property owners; to change provisions relating to the appointment of district board members; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Fulton County; change certain definitions; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Harry Geisinger [R] | Rep. Mike Dudgeon [R] | Rep. Jan Jones [R] | Rep. Edward Lindsey [R] |
Rep. Tom Rice [R] | Rep. Rich Golick [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #707 (Y: 49 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House Vote #764 (Y: 149 N: 1 NV: 21 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House Vote #764 (Y: 149 N: 1 NV: 21 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-02 | Effective Date | |
2014-04-02 | Act 354 | |
2014-04-02 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2014-03-26 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-03-13 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2014-03-13 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-03-13 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-03-06 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-03-05 | House | House First Readers |
2014-03-04 | House | House Hopper |