FL S1714 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifying three-tier system exceptions and application with respect to the manufacture, distribution, and sale of malt beverages; revising provisions relating to shipment of products to or between breweries; providing requirements for and limitations on the filling, refilling, and sale or distribution of growlers, etc.
Title
Malt Beverages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#19 (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | House | Died in Messages |
2014-04-29 | House | In Messages |
2014-04-29 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 30 NAYS 10 |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (337160, 684090) |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Ordered engrossed |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (961662) |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/14 |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2014-04-22 | Senate | CS/CS by Rules read 1st time |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2014-04-21 | Senate | CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 9 NAYS 4 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/21/14, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2014-04-10 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs read 1st time |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2014-04-08 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 1 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 04/08/14, 3:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Rules |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Filed |
2014-03-28 | Senate | SPB 7120 submitted as a committee bill (SB 1714) by Regulated Industries |
Same As/Similar To
H0283 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Regulatory Affairs Committee
H1329 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee
H7075 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Regulatory Affairs Committee
S0406 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Community Affairs
H0387 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died on Calendar
S0470 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Rules
H1329 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee
H7075 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Regulatory Affairs Committee
S0406 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Community Affairs
H0387 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died on Calendar
S0470 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Rules
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
561 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
561 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
561 | 221 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
561 | 37 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
561 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
561 | 5101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
562 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
563 | 022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
563 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
563 | 061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |