FL S1424 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Children and Families to create an online registry of persons who have passed the background screening requirements for employment in summer camps; authorizing the department to adopt rules, etc.
Title
Regulation of Summer Camps
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2014-04-24 | Senate | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2014-04-08 | Senate | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 04/08/14, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations; Rules |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0923 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Healthy Families Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
402 | 3053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 175 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |