FL S1038 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Citing this act as the "Veterinary Workforce Innovation Act"; authorizing certain individuals to use the title "veterinary professional associate"; authorizing such associates to perform certain duties and actions; providing that supervising veterinarians are liable for the acts or omissions of veterinary professional associates under their supervision and control, etc.
Title
Veterinary Professional Associates
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Senate | Died in Regulated Industries |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-01-04 | Senate | Referred to Regulated Industries; Agriculture; Rules |
2023-12-20 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1245 (Same As) 2024-03-08 - Died in Rules
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/1038 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/1038/BillText/Filed/HTML |