FL S0876 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Citing this act as the "Florida Unborn Victims of Violence Act"; providing a rule of construction that a person who engages in conduct that violates any provision of the Florida Criminal Code or of a criminal offense defined by another statute and causes the death of, or bodily injury to, an unborn child commits a separate offense if such an offense is not otherwise specifically provided for; providing for criminal penalties for such an offense, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Offenses Against Unborn Children

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-03SenateDied in Judiciary
2013-04-09SenateNow in Judiciary
2013-04-08SenateFavorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 4 NAYS 2
2013-04-03SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 04/08/13, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
2013-03-27SenateNow in Criminal Justice
2013-03-21SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Amendments)
2013-03-20SenateFavorable with 1 amendment(s) by Health Policy (714942); YEAS 6 NAYS 3
2013-03-15SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 03/20/13, 3:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2013-03-05SenateIntroduced
2013-02-19SenateReferred to Health Policy; Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Appropriations
2013-02-13SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H0759 (Same As) 2013-05-03 - Died in Health Policy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
316193Amended CodeSee Bill Text
43504Amended CodeSee Bill Text
775021Amended CodeSee Bill Text
782071Amended CodeSee Bill Text
78209Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9210022Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback