FL H7147 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-13 - Chapter No. 2014-154
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-13 - Chapter No. 2014-154
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services to include in its annual report recommendations for energy efficiency; authorizing an employer to present certain documents electronically or physically in order to show proof and certify to the permit issuer that it has secured compensation for its employees; authorizing an agency or local government to require rooftop equipment to be installed in compliance with the Florida Building Code if the equipment is being replaced or removed during reroofing and is not in compliance with the Florida Building Code's roof-mounted mechanical units requirements, etc.
Title
Building Construction Policies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#874 (Y: 117 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#26 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#720 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#26 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#720 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-13 | Chapter No. 2014-154 | |
2014-06-13 | Approved by Governor | |
2014-06-05 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2014-05-02 | House | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled |
2014-05-02 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 117 NAYS 1 |
2014-05-02 | House | Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (547728) |
2014-05-02 | House | Was taken up |
2014-05-01 | House | In returning messages |
2014-05-01 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (547728) |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/CS/SB 1044 |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Withdrawn from Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Agriculture; Appropriations |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Received |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Agriculture; Appropriations |
2014-04-25 | Senate | In Messages |
2014-04-25 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 115 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-04-24 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-04-24 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (287969, 385125) |
2014-04-24 | House | Amendment(s) failed (070707, 969103) |
2014-04-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-22 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/14 |
2014-04-17 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-04-16 | House | CS by Regulatory Affairs Committee read 1st time |
2014-04-15 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2014-04-10 | House | CS by- Regulatory Affairs Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-08 | House | On Committee agenda-- Regulatory Affairs Committee, 04/10/14, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2014-03-31 | House | Now in Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2014-03-31 | House | Favorable by Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-27 | House | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/31/14, 4:00 pm, Reed Hall |
2014-03-24 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2014-03-19 | House | Introduced |
2014-03-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1044 (Similar To) 2014-04-30 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7147 (Ch. 2014-154)
H4007 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Energy and Utilities Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7147 (Ch. 2014-154)
H0593 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Community Affairs, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7147 (Ch. 2014-154)
H0703 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in State Affairs Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7023 (Ch. 2014-218), CS/HB 7147 (Ch. 2014-154)
S1106 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7147 (Ch. 2014-154)
H4007 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Energy and Utilities Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7147 (Ch. 2014-154)
H0593 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Community Affairs, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7147 (Ch. 2014-154)
H0703 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in State Affairs Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7023 (Ch. 2014-218), CS/HB 7147 (Ch. 2014-154)
S1106 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7147 (Ch. 2014-154)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
162 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 323 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
377 | 6015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
377 | 703 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
377 | 712 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
377 | 801 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
377 | 802 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
377 | 803 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
377 | 806 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
377 | 807 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
377 | 815 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
377 | 816 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
440 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
514 | 0115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
514 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
514 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
553 | 37 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
553 | 721 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
553 | 73 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
553 | 74 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
553 | 77 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
553 | 775 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
553 | 79 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
553 | 80 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
553 | 841 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
553 | 883 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
553 | 993 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
633 | 202 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
633 | 212 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |