FL H7163 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-222
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-222
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Ratifies specified DJJ rules relating to provision of health services to youth in facilities or programs, for sole & exclusive purpose of satisfying any condition on effectiveness pursuant to s. 120.541(3), F.S.
Title
Ratification of Rules/Department of Juvenile Justice
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#21 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#603 (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#603 (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-20 | Chapter No. 2014-222 | |
2014-06-20 | Approved by Governor | |
2014-06-13 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2014-04-28 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 35 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Received |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/14 |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/21/14, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2014-04-11 | Senate | In Messages |
2014-04-11 | House | Immediately certified |
2014-04-11 | House | Passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 1 |
2014-04-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-04-09 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-04-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-07 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/09/14 |
2014-04-04 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-04-04 | House | Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-02 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/04/14, 9:30 am, Sumner Hall |
2014-04-01 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2014-03-26 | House | Introduced |
2014-03-26 | House | Filed |