FL H7021 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-11 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 524 (Ch. 2014-3), CS/CS/SB 522 (Ch. 2014-2)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-11 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 524 (Ch. 2014-3), CS/CS/SB 522 (Ch. 2014-2)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Designates act as "Protecting Our Children and Adults from Sexual Predators Act"; requires DCF to provide training to members of multidisciplinary team; requires department to maintain data on each case on recommendations of clinical evaluators; requires department to send to state attorney written assessment & determination as to whether person meets definition of sexually violent predator.
Title
Sexually Violent Predators
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-11 | House | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 524 (Ch. 2014-3), CS/CS/SB 522 (Ch. 2014-2) |
2014-03-11 | House | Substituted CS/SB 524 |
2014-03-07 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/11/14 |
2014-03-05 | House | CS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time |
2014-03-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-03-05 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2014-03-04 | House | CS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2014-03-03 | House | CS/CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2014-02-24 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 03/03/14, 12:30 pm, Sumner Hall |
2014-02-24 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2014-02-24 | House | CS referred to Judiciary Committee |
2014-02-21 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2014-02-20 | House | CS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2014-02-13 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/20/14, 9:00 am, Morris Hall |
2014-02-13 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2014-02-12 | House | Favorable by Appropriations Committee; YEAS 26 NAYS 0 |
2014-02-05 | House | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 02/12/14, 12:00 pm, Webster Hall |
2014-02-05 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2014-01-23 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0524 (Similar To) 2014-04-02 - Chapter No. 2014-3, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 522 (Ch. 2014-2)
S0522 (Similar To) 2014-04-02 - Chapter No. 2014-2, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 524 (Ch. 2014-3)
S0522 (Similar To) 2014-04-02 - Chapter No. 2014-2, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 524 (Ch. 2014-3)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1005 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 695 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 913 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 9135 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 914 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 930 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |