FL H0917 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Health Innovation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Health Innovation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides presumptive eligibility for Florida Kidcare program for children younger than specified age.
Title
Florida Kidcare Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | House | Died in Health Innovation Subcommittee |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2014-02-20 | House | Referred to Health Innovation Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2014-02-12 | House | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/917 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/0917/BillText/Filed/PDF |