FL H0915 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Introduced on February 20 2013 - 25% progress, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 112 (Ch. 2013-228)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits person from filing or causing to be filed, with intent to defraud another, document relating to ownership, transfer, or encumbrance of, or claim against, real or personal property, or any interest in real or personal property; provides for reclassification of certain offenses; provides for injunctions prohibiting violators from filing certain documents; provides for actions to obtain sealing of certain records; provides for ex parte injunctions; provides for hearings; provides for maintaining certain records under seal; provides legislative intent relating to provisions prohibiting actions under color of law or through use of simulated legal process.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fraudulent Actions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-29HouseLaid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 112 (Ch. 2013-228)
2013-04-29HouseSubstituted CS/CS/CS/SB 112
2013-04-26HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/29/13
2013-04-18HousePlaced on Calendar
2013-04-17HouseCS/CS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time
2013-04-17HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c)
2013-04-16HouseCS/CS/CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2013-04-12HouseOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/16/13, 2:00 pm, 404 HOB
2013-04-08HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2013-04-05HouseCS/CS by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time
2013-04-05HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2013-04-04HouseCS/CS by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2013-04-02HouseOn Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 04/04/13, 8:00 am, 404 HOB
2013-03-25HouseCS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time
2013-03-25HouseNow in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2013-03-22HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2013-03-19HouseCS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2013-03-15HouseOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 03/19/13, 9:00 am, 404 HOB
2013-03-05HouseIntroduced
2013-02-28HouseReferred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2013-02-20HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S0112 (Similar To) 2013-07-01 - Chapter No. 2013-228

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
817535Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8430855Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9210022Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback