FL H0697 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-17 - Chapter No. 2014-159
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-17 - Chapter No. 2014-159
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Adds to list of Schedule I controlled substances specified materials, compounds, mixtures, or preparations that contain hallucinogenic substances, or any of their salts, isomers, & salts of isomers, if existence of such salts, isomers, & salts of isomers is possible within specific chemical designation; provides reduced penalties for possession of 3 grams or less of specified controlled substances; provides that person who knowingly sells, purchases, manufactures, delivers, or brings into this state specified quantities of specified chemicals commits trafficking in Phenethylamines; provides that person who knowingly sells, purchases, manufactures, delivers, or brings into this state specified quantities of specified chemicals commits capital manufacture or importation of Phenethylamines; reenacts provisions.
Title
Controlled Substances
Sponsors
House Criminal Justice Subcommittee | Rep. Clay Ingram [R] | Rep. Dane Eagle [R] | Rep. Matt Hudson [R] |
Sen. Debbie Mayfield [R] | Rep. Jeanette Nunez [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#18 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#590 (Y: 106 N: 8 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#590 (Y: 106 N: 8 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-17 | Chapter No. 2014-159 | |
2014-06-16 | Approved by Governor | |
2014-06-05 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2014-04-28 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2014-04-28 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 25 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 780 |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Withdrawn from Criminal Justice; Appropriations |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Received |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations |
2014-04-21 | Senate | In Messages |
2014-04-11 | House | CS passed; YEAS 106 NAYS 8 |
2014-04-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-04-09 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-04-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-07 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/09/14 |
2014-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-03-21 | House | Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-19 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 03/21/14, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2014-03-11 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2014-03-11 | House | Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-07 | House | On Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/11/14, 9:30 am, Morris Hall |
2014-03-04 | House | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2014-02-14 | House | Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2014-02-13 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2014-02-12 | House | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2014-02-05 | House | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 02/12/14, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2014-01-21 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0780 (Same As) 2014-04-25 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 697 (Ch. 2014-159)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
893 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 135 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |