DE SJR8 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-31 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-31 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This joint resolution directs the implementation of a cross-agency review of regulatory and licensing practices, as recommended by the “Blue Collar” Task Force.
Title
Directing The Executive To Examine Overlapping Or Unnecessary Regulations Across Cabinet Departments And Recommend To The General Assembly Legislation Necessary To Address These Regulations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-31 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-12 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-12 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2014-06-12 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2014-05-07 | House | Reported Out of Committee (LABOR) in House with 5 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits |
2014-04-10 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Labor Committee in House |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 1 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Necessary rules are suspended in Senate |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |