DE SB77 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on June 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on June 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This legislation designates upper-level management positions in the Justice of the Peace Court from classified service to exempt service, consistent with similar positions in the Superior Court, Family Court and Court of Common Pleas. The provisions of this legislation shall become effective at the time the incumbent separates from service.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Certain Positions In The Justice Of The Peace Court.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2013-06-26 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-06-12 | House | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in House with 7 On Its Merits |
2013-06-06 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate |