DE SB26 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Passed on August 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Passed on August 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This legislation provides a default procedure for equitably allocating the cost of estate taxes among beneficiaries of an estate. It replaces Delaware’s current apportionment statute, but retains its basic approach of apportioning estate taxes among beneficiaries in proportion to their respective legacies, unless a decedent directed a different allocation method in an appropriate estate planning document. The legislation addresses ambiguities in existing law and draws on many provisions in the Uniform Estate Tax Apportionment Act. In general, the draft statute provides that (1) a person may mandate a different apportionment method in a will or trust; (2) in the absence of such directions, estate taxes will be allocated to beneficiaries to the extent each beneficiary’s inheritance generates estate tax; (3) estate tax attributable to time-limited interests over which a beneficiary does not have access to principal is paid from principal; (4) for property included in the estate but not available to pay tax (“insulated property”), taxes are allocated to persons receiving other property, but those persons may recover the tax from the insulated property when it is distributed; (5) the executor or trustee is granted power to collect the tax from the beneficiary, as well as to defer distribution, withhold estate tax from a distribution, or require a distributee to give security to ensure payment. The statute would apply to decedents dying on or after January 1, 2014.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 12 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Apportionment Of Estate Tax Liability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-05 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2013-07-01 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-06-05 | House | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in House with 1 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits |
2013-05-15 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate |