DE SB247 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This bill continues the current practice which allows school districts to hire qualified school nurses in a timely and appropriate manner. The bill keeps in place current language that requires applicants for school nurse to achieve a passing score on an examination of general knowledge within one fiscal year after the date of hire.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Educator Licensure, Certification, And Preparation Programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-30 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-25 | House | Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in House with 8 On Its Merits |
2014-06-17 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced in Senate |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Assigned to Education Committee in Senate |