DE SB243 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-4)
Status: Passed on July 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-4)
Status: Passed on July 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill specifies that probation and parole officers are included in the definition of “law-enforcement officer” for the purposes of the Delaware Criminal Code in Title 11 of the Delaware Code.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Crimes And Criminal Procedure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-21 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-26 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-25 | House | Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 4 On Its Merits |
2014-06-24 | House | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate |