DE SB24 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill will allow the Department of Transportation, Division of Motor Vehicles to enter into reciprocal agreements with other states and agencies for the purpose of toll interoperability as well as toll violation collections.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 21, Chapter 4, Of The Delaware Code Relating To Reciprocal Agreements For Toll Interoperability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-28 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2013-05-09 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-05-08 | House | Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY & HOMELAND SECURITY) in House with 7 On Its Merits |
2013-04-30 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (HIGHWAYS & TRANSPORTATION) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Assigned to Highways & Transportation Committee in Senate |