DE SB234 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This bill aligns language within Title 14, Chapter 5 with changes to education and charter policy made throughout the chapter as well as elsewhere in the title. These changes remedy inconsistencies in language between different sections of Delaware Code as a result of recent changes to licensure, certification, accounting system, as well as aligning all sections of Chapter 5 with specific dates and deadlines established through multiple bills in the past year. This bill organizes required reporting for charter schools within the chapter subsection referencing reports and also addresses the sunset of single gender charter school language from June 2013.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Charter Schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-15 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 16 YES 4 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-26 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 2 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-26 | House | Amendment HA 2 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2014-06-26 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Stricken |
2014-06-26 | House | Amendment HA 2 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2014-06-17 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced in House |
2014-06-17 | House | Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in House with 10 On Its Merits |
2014-06-10 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 16 YES 4 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 1 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced in Senate |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in Senate with 5 Favorable |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Assigned to Education Committee in Senate |