DE SB224 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act amends the Charter of the Town of Laurel to permit issuance of general obligation bonds, certificates of indebtedness, notes, or other obligations by the Town of Laurel, without a public hearing and special election, up to the aggregate amount outstanding at any time of $17,000,000.00.
Title
An Act To Amend The Charter Of The Town Of Laurel With Regard To Increasing The Limit For Authorizing General Obligation Bonds, Certificates Of Indebtedness, Notes, Bonds, Or Other Obligations, Without Requiring A Public Hearing And A Special Election.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-30 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-30 | House | Necessary rules are suspended in House |
2014-06-27 | House | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (COMMUNITY/COUNTY AFFAIRS) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Assigned to Community/County Affairs Committee in Senate |