DE SB221 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-7)
Status: Passed on July 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-7)
Status: Passed on July 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act allows political committees to give campaign contributions back to their donors.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 15 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Campaign Expenditures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-23 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-30 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-18 | House | Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 3 On Its Merits |
2014-06-10 | House | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES/ELECTIONS) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Assigned to Administrative Services/Elections Committee in Senate |