DE SB220 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Bill implements the recommendations of the Lottery & Gaming Study Commission created by the 147th General Assembly. Effective July 1, 2014, certain video lottery equipment costs will be deducted prior to calculation of the State’s share of revenue. Effective July 1, 2015, the State’s share of gross table game revenues is revised to 15% and the table game license fee is eliminated beginning with the fee for fiscal year 2016. No changes are being made to the revenue sharing model as it relates to purses for the harness and thoroughbred industries. The Lottery & Gaming Study Commission shall reconvene in the summer of 2015 to make further recommendations relative to the gaming industry. In addition, the Secretary of Agriculture shall commission an independent report to examine the harness and thoroughbred industries.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Lotteries.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-07-01 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 27 YES 10 NO 3 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-07-01 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Stricken |
2014-07-01 | House | Necessary rules are suspended in House |
2014-06-30 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2014-06-30 | House | Reported Out of Committee (GAMING & PARIMUTUELS) in House with 6 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable |
2014-06-27 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Gaming & Parimutuels Committee in House |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 14 YES 5 NO 1 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Amendment SA 4 - Laid On Table in Senate |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Amendment SA 4 - Introduced in Senate |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Amendment SA 3 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 15 YES 3 NO 2 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Amendment SA 2 - Stricken |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Stricken |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Amendment SA 3 - Introduced in Senate |
2014-06-24 | Senate | Amendment SA 2 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate |
2014-06-24 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (FINANCE) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate |