DE SB211 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act establishes a 30-day late renewal period for certified nursing assistants during which they may still work. Certifications renewed during the 30-day late renewal period will be charged a fee for late renewal rather than having to retake the certified nursing assistant test and pay the testing fee. This will create less of a financial hardship on the certified nursing assistant and will allow the employing facility(ies) to keep the certified nursing assistant on their schedule, providing for continuity of care for the residents of facilities.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Certified Nursing Assistants.
Sponsors
Sen. Bethany Hall-Long [D] | Rep. Michael Barbieri [D] | Sen. David Sokola [D] | Rep. Earl Jaques [D] |
Rep. Quinton Johnson [D] | Rep. John Kowalko [D] | Sen. David Wilson [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-30 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-11 | House | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 8 On Its Merits |
2014-05-29 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate |