DE SB185 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-31 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-31 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
Delaware employment discrimination law applies to employers of 4 or more employees within the State for all protected classes (race; marital status; genetic information; color; age; religion; sex; sexual orientation; gender identity; national origin) apart from disability. Only larger employers with 15 or more employees are subject to the State disability-based employment discrimination law. This bill removes the inconsistency by adopting the same definition of “employer” for all protected classes, including disability. Neighboring states have adopted a uniform definition of “employer” which applies to all protected classes [Pa. Code – 43. P.S. 952-954; Md. Code - 20-601-602; N.J. Code - 10:5-5].
Title
An Act To Amend Title 19 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Persons With Disabilities Employment Protections Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-31 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-30 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 25 YES 15 NO 1 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-11 | House | Reported Out of Committee (LABOR) in House with 1 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits |
2014-06-04 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Labor Committee in House |
2014-06-03 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 15 YES 5 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (EXECUTIVE) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate |