DE SB173 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Bill amends the Charter for the Town of Henlopen Acres to clarify that all candidates for Town Commissioner and all serving Town Commissioners must be eligible to vote in the annual municipal election. This Bill also modifies the qualifications for voter eligibility in municipal elections, including (1) reducing from six months to thirty days the real property owner durational requirement for voter eligibility, (2) requiring registration in the Town Books of Registered Voters, and (3) establishing a voter eligibility requirement of a fifty percent (50%) ownership interest in real property for an individual or entity to vote as a real property owner. Changes for Commissioners include increasing from thirty days to one year the durational requirement for qualification to run as a resident Commissioner, allowing a non-resident Commissioner to stay as a non-resident Commissioner after selling property if becomes a resident. If a resident Commissioner is no longer a resident, can stay on as a non-resident Commissioner if a property owner, unless there would no longer be four resident Commissioners. Additionally, this bill corrects the numbering and lettering of provisions which, through previous amendments, became non-sequential.
Title
An Act To Amend The Charter Of The Town Of Henlopen Acres Relating To The Qualifications Of Mayor, Commissioners, And Voters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-05-01 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-04-30 | House | Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 5 On Its Merits |
2014-04-10 | House | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (COMMUNITY/COUNTY AFFAIRS) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Assigned to Community/County Affairs Committee in Senate |