DE SB134 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Bill amends the Board’s provisions relating to discipline in order to make the Board’s licensing law consistent with other Title 24 boards. The Bill specifies the grounds for discipline and possible disciplinary sanctions. A provision is added to permit emergency suspension of a license or certificate. Finally, the Bill outlines the possible sanctions for unlicensed practice.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 24 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Manufactured Home Installation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-06 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2013-06-30 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-06-27 | House | Reported Out of Committee (SUNSET COMMITTEE (POLICY ANALYSIS & GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY)) in House with 5 On Its Merits |
2013-06-27 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (SUNSET) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Assigned to Sunset Committee in Senate |