DE SB127 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This bill is the result of recommendations made by the Joint Sunset Committee and makes several amendments to Title 11 relating to the Board of Parole. This bill adds victim advocacy to be included as one of the potential qualifications to be considered for appointment to the Board of Parole. This bill provides that Board members terms shall expire on a staggered basis. This bill provides that a member may be deemed in neglect of duty if they are absent from 3 consecutive Board meetings without adequate reason or if they attend less than 50% of the Board meetings in a calendar year. This bill also clarifies that the Chairperson of the Board of Parole shall have responsibility for managing the Board of Parole staff and shall serve as the link between the Board, the Department of Correction, the Legislature, and the Governor.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Board Of Parole.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-29 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-30 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-25 | House | Reported Out of Committee (SUNSET COMMITTEE (POLICY ANALYSIS & GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY)) in House with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits |
2014-06-19 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 1 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced in Senate |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (SUNSET) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Assigned to Sunset Committee in Senate |