DE SB12 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill adds AEMTs and paramedics to the class of victims that raises the level of offense to a class A misdemeanor. This change is necessary because last year, SB 210, which updated EMS practitioner titles, was enacted into law but those new titles were not added to the Criminal Code where the EMS titles are also used.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Advanced Emergency Technicians And Paramedics.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2013-06-27 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-06-19 | House | Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY & HOMELAND SECURITY) in House with 1 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits |
2013-06-13 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 1 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to Public Safety Committee in Senate |