DE HB85 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-9)
Status: Passed on September 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-9)
Status: Passed on September 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill grants authority to the Delaware Commission of Veterans’ Affairs to establish and administer the “Delaware Veterans Trust Fund.” Honorably discharged Delaware veterans will be permitted to petition the Fund for financial assistance relative to health care, homelessness, household utilities, home repair, and education.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Relating To The Delaware Commission Of Veterans’ Affairs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-17 | House | Signed by Governor |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 17 YES 1 NO 3 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (FINANCE) in Senate with 5 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate |
2013-05-02 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-05-01 | House | Reported Out of Committee (VETERANS AFFAIRS) in House with 16 Favorable |
2013-04-18 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Veterans Affairs Committee in House |