DE HB77 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Introduced on April 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-14 - Amendment HA 1 - Stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-14 - Amendment HA 1 - Stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill allows a hunter to use a handgun in lieu of a shotgun on farms permitted by DNREC through their deer depredation programs to reduce agricultural crop damage.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 7 Of The Delaware Code Relating To A Certain Use Of A Handgun.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-14 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Stricken |
2013-05-30 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2013-05-15 | House | Reported Out of Committee (NATURAL RESOURCES) in House with 6 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits |
2013-04-16 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Natural Resources Committee in House |