DE HB416 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Passed on July 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Passed on July 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
People First Language (“PFL”) legislation is part of a national movement to promote dignity and inclusion for people with disabilities. PFL specifies that the order of terms used to describe any individual places the person first, and the description of the person second. For example, when using PFL, outdated terms such as “the disabled” would be phrased as “persons with disabilities.” This language emphasizes that individuals are people first, and that their disabilities are secondary. In compliance with PFL guidelines, this Act amends current references to persons with disabilities throughout the Code by placing the person first and the disability second. Also pursuant to PFL, this Act removes offensive and/or insensitive language from the Code and replaces that language with respectful language. For example, the Act replaces antiquated and offensive terms such as “mental retardation” and “mental illness” with more appropriate terms like “intellectual disability” and “mental condition,” respectively. This effort was initiated during the 146th General Assembly and this bill continues the process of making additional PFL changes to the Code.
Title
An Act To Amend Titles 6, 10, 11, 12, 16, 19, 21, 25, And 28 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Removal Of Insensitive And Offensive Language.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-29 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Necessary rules are suspended in Senate |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Assigned to Committee in Senate |
2014-06-26 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-26 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2014-06-25 | House | Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 5 On Its Merits |
2014-06-24 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced in House |
2014-06-18 | House | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House |