DE HB401 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
The bill makes clear that Legislative Council, rather than Government Support Services, is responsible for receiving certification of the need for the printed version of the Code and the Rules from State entities or agencies. This change is intended to centralize the responsibility for maintaining and paying for the printed version of the Code and the Rules with one entity, Legislative Council. Centralizing these responsibilities with Legislative Council is done in recognition that Legislative Council is already responsible for producing the material contained in the Code, paying the Code Revisors, consulting with the Code Revisors regarding the contract to publish the Code, and paying for the Code supplements, Rules, and Rules supplements. The bill also clarifies that the Code Revisors are to consult with Legislative Council regarding the number of copies of the Code supplements, Rules, and Rules supplements to be printed and delivered by the publisher each year. Additionally, the bill makes numerous changes throughout Chapters 1 and 2 of Title 1 to clarify the historical involvement of the Code Revisors and Legislative Council related to the Delaware Rules. Finally, the bill modifies 220 of Title 1 to provide flexibility in the delivery of printed copies of the Code, Rules, and Rules supplements in recognition that such copies are currently being delivered directly to the requesting State entity or agency pursuant to the terms of the contract with the publisher of the Code and the Rules.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 1 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Delaware Code And Continuous Code Revision.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-05 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (EXECUTIVE) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2014-06-24 | Senate | Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate |
2014-06-24 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-18 | House | Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 3 On Its Merits |
2014-06-12 | House | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House |